EP1189291 - Chip type light emitting diode and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1, Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi Yamanashi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Citizen Electronics Co., Ltd. 1-23-1, Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukasawa, Koichi Citizen Electronics Co. Ltd., 1-23-1, Kamikurechi Fujiyoshida-shi, Yamanashi / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Bubb, Antony John Allen, et al Wilson Gunn Gee, Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307541.1 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000278087 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000278087 | JP20010210604 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001210604 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189291 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189291 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H01L33/54 (EP,US);
G02B6/4202 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
H01L33/483 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/48] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierende Diode in Chipbauweise und Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/12] | English: | Chip type light emitting diode and method of manufacture thereof | [2002/12] | French: | Diode émettrice de lumière de type puce et méthode de fabrication | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2003 | 30.09.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55108786 ; | [X]JPH02151086 ; | [X]JPH0529659 ; | [X]JPH05114751 ; | [X]JPH05327021 ; | [X]JPH06310762 ; | [X]US4742432 (THILLAYS JACQUES C [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 39 *; | [A]US5331512 (ORTON KEVIN R [US]) [A] 1,4* column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 48 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801104), vol. 004, no. 157, Database accession no. (E - 032), & JP55108786 A 19800821 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900830), vol. 014, no. 401, Database accession no. (E - 0971), & JP02151086 A 19900611 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [X] 1-3,5-9 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930615), vol. 017, no. 313, Database accession no. (E - 1381), & JP05029659 A 19930205 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930830), vol. 017, no. 476, Database accession no. (E - 1424), & JP05114751 A 19930507 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-3,5-9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940310), vol. 018, no. 144, Database accession no. (E - 1521), & JP05327021 A 19931210 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1-3,5-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0027] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06310762 A 19941104 (SANYO ELECTRIC ET AL) [X] 1,3,5-8 * abstract * |