EP1189074 - Method and apparatus for locking sample volume onto moving vessel in pulsed doppler ultrasound imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pan, Lihong 4790 Old Church Road Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US | 02 /
Mo, Larry Y. L. 42840 Christy Street, Suite 201 Fremont, Canada 84538 / US | 03 /
Dong, Fang 2901 Woodridge Lane Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | 04 /
Owen, Cindy Andrews 257 Buena Vista Place Memphis, Tennessee 38112 / US | 05 /
Stanson, Robert 35 Kingswood Drive, P.O. Box 767 LaSalle, Manitoba R0G 1B0 / CA | 06 /
Kristoffersen, Kjell Montebelloveien 7 0379 Oslo / NO | [2002/28] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
Pan, Lihong 4790 Old Church Road Brookfield, Wisconsin 53045 / US | ||
02 /
Mo, Larry Y. L. 1707 Saratoga Road Waukesha, Wisconsin 53186 / US | |||
03 /
Dong, Fang 5317 Century Avenue, Apartment 6 Middletown, Wisconsin 53562 / US | |||
04 /
Owen, Cindy Andrews 257 Buena Vista Place Memphis, Tennessee 38112 / US | |||
05 /
Stanson, Robert 35 Kingswood Drive, P.O. Box 767 LaSalle, Manitoba R0G 1B0 / CA | |||
06 /
Kristoffersen, Kjell Montebelloveien 7 0379 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/12] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307839.9 | 14.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | US20000661749 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 661749 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189074 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189074 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189074 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S15/89, G01S7/52, A61B8/06 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G01S15/8984 (EP,US);
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
A61B8/13 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP,US);
G01S15/8986 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | G01S15/89, G01S7/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/12] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verriegelung des abgetasteten Volumens auf einem beweglichen Blutgefäss in Doppler- Impuls- Ultrachallbilderzeugung | [2002/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for locking sample volume onto moving vessel in pulsed doppler ultrasound imaging | [2002/12] | French: | Méthode et appareil de verrouillage de volume d'échantillonnage sur un vaisseau mobile dans une imagerie ultrasonore Doppler employant des impulsions | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06217975 ; | [A]EP0421465 (SPACELABS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0985380 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5615680 (SANO AKIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XY] - WILSON ET AL., "Automatic vessel tracking and measurement for Doppler studies", ULTRASOUND IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 16, no. 7, pages 645 - 652, XP009030642 [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10 * abstract * * page 645, column L - page 648, column L * * page 649, column L - page 652, column L * [Y] 2,6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0301-5629(90)90096-U | [Y] - QIN-SHENG CHEN ET AL, "SYMMETRIC PHASE-ONLY MATCHED FILTERING OF FOURIER-MELLIN TRANSFORMSFOR IMAGE REGISTRATION AND RECOGNITION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19941201), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1156 - 1168, XP000486818 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1156, column L - page 1157, column R * * page 1159, column L * * page 1163 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.387491 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941108), vol. 018, no. 582, Database accession no. (C - 1270), & JP06217975 A 19940809 (TOSHIBA MEDICAL ENG CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0017] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0072] * * paragraphs [0093] , [0094] * |