EP1191301 - Water distribution conduit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BALTIMORE AIRCOIL COMPANY, INC. 7595 Montevideo Road Jessup, MD 20794 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states BALTIMORE AIRCOIL COMPANY, INC. 7595 Montevideo Road Jessup Maryland 20794 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garrish, Bryan F. 7817 Brookstone Court Ellicott City, Maryland 21043 / US | 02 /
Carter, Thomas P. 6 Megans Court Olney, Maryland 20832 / US | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307923.1 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | US20000667029 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: US 667029 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191301 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191301 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191301 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28F25/06 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
F28F25/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [2003/16] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wasserverteilerrohr | [2002/13] | English: | Water distribution conduit | [2002/13] | French: | Conduite de distribution d'eau | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 06.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB525500 (L G MOUCHEL & PARTNERS LTD, et al) [X] 1-4,8-12 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [A]FR1107274 (MARGEN PETER HEINRICH ERWIN) [A] 1,5,10,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3419251 (ECKERT JOHN S) [A] 1,3,7,10,12 * figures 1,2,9 *; | [A]US4720358 (CROPP KENTON A [US]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [X]WO9809128 (MARLEY COOLING TOWER CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8-12 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US4208359 | US5431858 |