EP1190870 - Wheel bearing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [2010/09] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states NTN CORPORATION 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tajima, Eiji c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Ogura, Hiroyuki c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Syougo c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Fukushima, Shigeaki c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Umekida, Mitsuru c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 06 /
Torii, Akira c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 07 /
Sera, Akira c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 08 /
Ohtsuki, Hisashi c/o NTN Corporation, 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/13] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01307971.0 | 19.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000285815 | 20.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000285815 | JP20000315519 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000315519 | JP20010015842 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001015842 | JP20010035907 | 13.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001035907 | JP20010168619 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001168619 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1190870 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1190870 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190870 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, F16D1/072, F16D3/223 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
B60B27/00 (EP,US);
B60B27/0005 (EP,US);
B60B27/001 (EP,US);
B60B27/0026 (EP,US);
B60B27/0036 (EP,US);
B60B27/0042 (EP,US);
B60B27/0084 (EP,US);
B60B27/0094 (EP,US);
F16C35/0635 (EP,US);
F16D1/072 (EP,US);
F16C19/186 (EP,US);
F16C19/187 (EP,US);
F16C19/505 (EP);
F16C2240/80 (EP);
F16C2326/02 (EP,US);
F16C43/04 (EP,US);
F16D2003/2232 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22326 (EP,US);
F16D2300/10 (EP,US);
Y10S464/905 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | B60B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/16] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Radlagervorrichtung | [2002/13] | English: | Wheel bearing device | [2002/13] | French: | Dispositif de palier de roue | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 10.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08005285.5 / EP2030807 | EP08018211.6 Application withdrawn : 20.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06294419 ; | [XA]DE3907105 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-5,8; | [XAY]EP0892187 (NSK LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * page 13, line 33 - page 14, line 18; figure 12 * * abstract * [A] 2-5,8 [Y] 1 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06294419 A 19941021 (NIPPON ROTSUKUTAITO KK; others: 01) [Y] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0892187 |