EP1193646 - Image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirk, Richard Antony 65 Hemel Hempstead Road Redbourn, Herts AL3 7NL / GB | 02 /
Lyons, Alexander Ralph, c/o Canon Res. Cent Europe The Braccans, London Road Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 2XH / GB | 03 /
Baumberg, Adam Michael, c/o Canon Res. Cent Europe The Braccans, London Road Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 2XH / GB | 04 /
Taylor, Richard Ian, c/o Canon Res. Cent Europe Lt The Braccans, London Road Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 2XH / GB | 05 /
Kotcheff, Aaron W.C 76, Selkirk Road London, SW 17 0EP / GB | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2008/25] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Limited 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Middlesex, Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford & Co., 2-5 Warwick Court, High Holborn London WC1R 5DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308112.0 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | GB20000023681 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: GB 0023681 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193646 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193646 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06T7/00 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
G06T7/55 (EP,US);
G06T7/80 (EP,US);
G06T2200/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | G06T1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/39] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2002/14] | English: | Image processing apparatus | [2002/14] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'images | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0548629 (IBM [US]) [Y] 37,38,72,73 * page 3, lines 1-27 ** figures 3A-3C *; | [A]EP0901105 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-36,39-71,74,75 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] *; | [XY]WO0004506 (GEOMETRIX INC [US]) [X] 1-36,39-71,74,75 * abstract * * page 17, line 4 - line 11 * * page 19, line 22 - line 28 * * page 20 - page 21 * * figure 1A * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * [Y] 37,38,72,73; | [A]US6072898 (BEATY ELWIN M [US], et al) [A] 1-36,39-71,74,75 * abstract * * column 2, line 21 - line 23 * * figures 1A-1B3 * * figure 2A *; | [A] - FITZGIBBON A W ET AL, "Automatic 3D model construction for turn-table sequences", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19980606), ISSN 0302-9743, pages 155 - 170, XP002121436 [A] 1-36,39-71,74,75 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-49437-5_11 | Examination | US6081273 |