EP1193872 - Reset circuit comprising a ferroelectric capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takata, Hidekazu 292-3 Minamikideracho 3-chome Nara-shi, Nara / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308162.5 | 26.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000297663 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000297663 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193872 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193872 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/22, G06F1/24 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G06F1/24 (EP,US);
H03K17/22 (KR);
H03K17/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Resetschaltung mit ferroelektrischem Kondensator | [2002/14] | English: | Reset circuit comprising a ferroelectric capacitor | [2002/14] | French: | Circuit de remise à zéro à la mise sous tension avec un condensateur ferroélectrique | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5332962 (SAMESHIMA KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1,21 * abstract *; | [A]US6005423 (SCHULTZ DAVID P [US]) [A] 1,21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3274567 (ENNIO FATUZZO) [A] 1,21 * figure 2 * |