EP1193508 - Method and apparatus for capturing magnetic resonance signals, recording medium and system for magnetic resonance imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Aki 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8503 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Pedder, James Cuthbert GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308184.9 | 26.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000299274 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000299274 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193508 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193508 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/565 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01R33/56518 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung magnetischer Resonanzsignale, sowie Aufnahmemedium und System für die Bildgebung mittels magnetischer Resonanz | [2002/14] | English: | Method and apparatus for capturing magnetic resonance signals, recording medium and system for magnetic resonance imaging | [2002/14] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'acquisition de signaux de résonance magnétique, moyen d'enregistrement et système d'imagerie par résonance magnétique | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 02.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0973042 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034]; figure 4 *; | [A]US5055791 (LEROUX PATRICK [FR], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7 * column 7, line 28 - column 7, line 42; figure 1 * |