Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1193972
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.11.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
25.11.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
18.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.11.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.03.2009 |
New entry: Invitation to provide information on prior art |
|
20.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.02.2008 |
First examination report |
|
09.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.11.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
02.03.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
15.02.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |