Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002107826 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000294686 | 27.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1193972 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | B1 | EP1193972 | 03.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000294686 | 27.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1174283C | 03.11.2004 | C | CN1347004 | 01.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000294686 | 27.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6746125 | 08.06.2004 | B2 | US2002041362 | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000294686 | 27.09.2000 |