EP1192901 - Position dependent X-ray filtration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | [2007/36] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states GE Medical Systems Global Technology Company LLC 3000 North Grandview Boulevard Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188-1696 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horiuchi, Tetsuya 7-127, Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8503 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308242.5 | 27.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000296913 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000296913 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192901 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1192901 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, G21K1/10 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/00 (KR);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
G21K1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Positionsabhängige Röntgenfilterung | [2002/14] | English: | Position dependent X-ray filtration | [2002/14] | French: | Filtration de rayons X dépendante de la position | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/49] | 01.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 05.12.2007 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/44] | FR | 02.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9716721 (ANALOGIC CORP [US]) [Y] 2,10* page 16, line 6 - line 13 *; | [XY]EP0981999 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] * [Y] 2,10 |