EP1249840 - Magnetic disk device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, Masaharu, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Ino, Tsuneyori, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Mitsuaki, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Nagamori, Tomohiro, c/o Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308316.7 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010115287 | 13.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001115287 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249840 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249840 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249840 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/14, G11B25/04, G11B5/60 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G11B33/148 (EP,US);
G11B21/21 (KR);
G11B5/6005 (EP,US);
G11B5/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | G11B33/14, G11B25/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetplattenlaufwerk | [2002/42] | English: | Magnetic disk device | [2002/42] | French: | Disque dur magnétique | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 08.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4703379 (BOGDANSKI MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1,6* column 4, line 37 - line 57 *; | [XA]EP0450184 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 8 - column 6, line 18 * [A] 2-5; | [X]US5134530 (HALL JONATHAN E [US]) [X] 1,6 * column 4, line 25 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6091570 (HENDRIKS FERDINAND [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 18 - line 63 * |