EP1195260 - Heat-sensitive recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuo, Hirofumi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Tsutomu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Masayuki c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., No. 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Brookes IP Windsor House 6-10 Mount Ephraim Road Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308395.1 | 02.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | JP20000303915 | 03.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000303915 | JP20000312250 | 12.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000312250 | JP20000321403 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000321403 | JP20000322268 | 23.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000322268 | JP20000323969 | 24.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000323969 | JP20000387793 | 20.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000387793 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195260 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195260 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/30, B41M5/40 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41M5/3335 (EP,US);
B41M5/3375 (EP,US);
B41M5/3336 (EP,US);
B41M5/3372 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/19] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [2002/15] | English: | Heat-sensitive recording material | [2002/15] | French: | Matériau thermosensible pour l'enregistrement | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 14.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]US4482905 (KANEKO KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,20,21 * column 2, line 18 - line 42 * * column 3, line 65 - line 70; example E * * example 1; claims 1,8,9 * [X] 4-10; | [X]JPH02145560 ; | [X]JPS57212434 ; | [A]EP0997315 (NICCA CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 55 - line 57 * * claims 1,9 *; | [E]EP1138517 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [E] 1-10,17-21 * page 2, line 40 - line 54 * * page 12, line 27; examples 1-25 * * claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900823), vol. 014, no. 390, Database accession no. (C - 0751), & JP02145560 A 19900605 (KAO CORP) [X] 4-19 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830319), vol. 007, no. 067, Database accession no. (P - 184), & JP57212434 A 19821227 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 4-19 * abstract * |