EP1193507 - Low noise MRI scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edelstein, William Alan 16 Oak Tree Lane Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Mallozzi, Richard Philip 623 Foxwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 03 /
Hedeen, Robert Arvin 10 Iverness Lane Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 04 /
El-Hamamsy, Sayed-Amr 217 Mohawk Trails Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 05 /
Miller, Mark Lloyd 2120 Baker Avenue East Schnectady, New York 12309 / US | 06 /
Thompson, Paul Shadforth 62 Tinley Road Stephentown, New York 12168 / US | 07 /
Ackermann, Robert Adolph 4125 Consaul Road Schenectady, New York 12304 / US | 08 /
Amm, Bruce Campbell 7 Vineyard Circle Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 09 /
Fura, John Peter 4110 Jockey Street Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | 10 /
Radziun, Mike James 29040 Linda Lane Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | 11 /
Dean, David Edward 288 Hickory Court Hartland, Wisconsin 53185 / US | 12 /
Mansell, Scott Thomas 603 Fox Knoll Drive Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | 13 /
Purgil, Dewain Anthony W303 S1752 Brandbrook Road Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | 14 /
Vavrek, Robert Michael 3002 Kisdon Hill Drive Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Edelstein, William Alan 16 Oak Tree Lane Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | ||
02 /
Mallozzi, Richard Philip 623 Foxwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | |||
03 /
Hedeen, Robert Arvin 10 Iverness Lane Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | |||
04 /
El-Hamamsy 217 Mohawk Trails Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | |||
05 /
Miller, Mark Lloyd 2120 Baker Avenue East Schnectady, New York 12309 / US | |||
06 /
Thompson, Paul Shadforth 62 Tinley Road Stephentown, New York 12168 / US | |||
07 /
Ackermann, Robert Adolph 4125 Consaul Road Schenectady, New York 12304 / US | |||
08 /
Amm, Bruce Campbell 7 Vineyard Circle Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | |||
09 /
Fura, John Peter 4110 Jockey Street Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US | |||
10 /
Radziun, Mike James 29040 Linda Lane Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | |||
11 /
Dean, David Edward 288 Hickory Court Hartland, Wisconsin 53185 / US | |||
12 /
Mansell, Scott Thomas 603 Fox Knoll Drive Waterford, Wisconsin 53185 / US | |||
13 /
Purgil, Dewain Anthony W303 S1752 Brandbrook Road Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | |||
14 /
Vavrek, Robert Michael 3002 Kisdon Hill Drive Waukesha, Wisconsin 53188 / US | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Goode, Ian Roy GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308414.0 | 02.10.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | US20000676945 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: US 676945 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193507 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193507 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193507 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/38, G01R33/385 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G01R33/3854 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | G01R33/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2005/08] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gerät der bildgebenden magnetischen Resonanz mit geringer Lärmemission | [2002/14] | English: | Low noise MRI scanner | [2002/14] | French: | Scanner IRM à faible bruit | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0350640 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 10* claims 1-5 *; | [XY]US5179338 (LASKARIS EVANGELOS T [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 23 * * column 5, line 9 - line 25 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]US5235283 (LEHNE DIETMAR [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6 * column 5, line 8 - line 63 *; | [Y]US5345177 (SATO TAICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 23 - line 31 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 5 *; | [Y]US5617026 (YOSHINO HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 39 - line 49 *; | [X]US5698980 (SELLERS MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 5 - line 8 *; | [Y]EP0981057 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 2,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] , [0019] *; | [Y]DE19838390 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 2, line 11 - line 16 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 1 *; | [X]US6107799 (SELLERS MICHAEL [GB], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 1 - line 64 * * column 5, line 48 - line 61 *; | [X] - KATSUNUMA A. ET AL, ""Silent MRI system" by interrupting the vibrational transmission through the air and solid structures", PROCEEDING OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, EIGHTH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, Denver, (20000401), XP002261812 [X] 1 * the whole document * |