EP1197577 - Method for introducing small amounts of refractory elements into a vapor deposition coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/16] | Apparatus and method for introducing small amounts of refractory elements into a vapor deposition coating | ||
[2012/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corderman, Reed Roeder 4021 Windsor Drive Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Melvin Robert 2208 Niskayuna Drive Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Nardi, Richard Arthur, Jr. 14 Commerce Street Scotia, New York 12302 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308421.5 | 02.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | US20000684425 | 10.10.2000 Original published format: US 684425 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197577 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197577 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197577 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/30, C23C14/16 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
C23C14/30 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/39] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einführung kleiner Mengen von Refractärelementen in eine aufgedampfte Beschichtung | [2012/27] | English: | Method for introducing small amounts of refractory elements into a vapor deposition coating | [2012/27] | French: | Méthode pour l'introduction de petites quantités d'éléments réfractaires dans un revêtement déposé de la phase vapeur | [2012/27] |
Former [2002/16] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Einführung kleiner Mengen von Refractärelementen in eine aufgedampfte Beschichtung | ||
Former [2002/16] | Apparatus and method for introducing small amounts of refractory elements into a vapor deposition coating | ||
Former [2002/16] | Dispositif et méthode pour l'introduction de petites quantités d'éléments réfractaires dans un revêtement déposé de la phase vapeur | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Request for further processing for: | 09.10.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.10.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0799904 (INT CENTER FOR ELECTRON BEAM T [UA]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13 * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 48; figure 3; example 4 * [Y] 3,9,12,14; | [Y]US5698273 (AZAD FARZIN HOMAYOUN [US], et al) [Y] 9,12,14 * column 3, line 58 - line 67 *; | [Y]JPH1096077 ; | [A]EP0969115 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * examples 1,2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10096077 A 19980414 (INOUE AKIHISA;YKK CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * |