EP1199371 - Methods for identifying products employing reporter gene expression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RheoGene Holdings Inc. 2650 Eisenhower Avenue Norristown, PA 19403 / US | [2003/44] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinstein, Barry 417 Bluebird Lane Dresher, Pennsylvania 19025 / US | 02 /
Keller, Lorraine Holowach 611 Pennbrook Avenue Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | 03 /
Palli, Subba Reddy 832 Garfield Avenue Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [2002/17] | Kent, Venetia Katherine Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308598.0 | 09.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | US20000690391 | 17.10.2000 Original published format: US 690391 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199371 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199371 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
C12Q1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/16] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Identifizierung von Produkten unter Verwendung von Reportergenexpression | [2002/17] | English: | Methods for identifying products employing reporter gene expression | [2002/17] | French: | Méthode d'identification de produits utilisant l'expression d'un gène rapporteur | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/30] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8706383 (BIOTECHNICA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO9833162 (BIOCODE INC [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 3, line 7 - line 16 * * page 16, line 8 - line 20 * * claims 1,2 *; | [XA]WO9910510 (ARIAD GENE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 20-24 * page 4, line 13 * * claims 33,58 * [A] 1-19; | [DXA] - YAO T-P ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL ECDYSONE RECEPTOR IS THE PRODUCT OF ECR AND ULTRASPIRACLE GENES", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19931202), vol. 366, no. 6454, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 476 - 479, XP002036327 [DX] 20 * the whole document * [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/366476a0 | [A] - FIELDS S ET AL, "A NOVEL GENETIC SYSTEM TO DETECT PROTEIN-PROTEIN INTERACTIONS", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19890720), vol. 340, no. 6230, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 245 - 246, XP000103144 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/340245a0 |