EP1201343 - Turbine bucket with turbulated cooling passage and electrode for electochemical machining. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/18] | Electrochemical machining process, electrode therefor and turbine bucket with turbulated cooling passage | ||
[2007/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Robert Alan 308 Wild Horse Creek Drive Simpsonville, South Carolina 29680 / US | 02 /
Lee, Ching-Pang 12 Camargo Pines Lane Cincinnati, Ohio 45243 / US | 03 /
Wei, Bin 8 Danforth Road Mechanicville, New York 12118 / US | 04 /
Wang, Hsin-Pang 773 Riverview Road Rexford, New York 12148 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2002/18] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01308777.0 | 16.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | US20000688579 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: US 688579 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1201343 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1201343 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201343 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23H9/14, B23H9/10, F01D5/14, B23P15/02 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
B23H9/14 (EP,US);
B23H3/04 (EP,US);
B23H9/10 (EP,US);
F05B2260/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2005/03] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbinenschaufeln mit turbulent durchströmten Kühlungskanälen und Elektrode zur elektrochemischen Bearbeitung | [2008/26] | English: | Turbine bucket with turbulated cooling passage and electrode for electochemical machining. | [2007/46] | French: | Aubes de turbines avec des passages de refroidissemnet avec écoulement turbulent et électrode pour usinage par électrochimie | [2008/26] |
Former [2002/18] | Elektrochemisches Bearbeitungsverfahren, Elektrode dafür, und Gasturbinenschaufeln mit turbulent durchströmten Kühlungskanälen | ||
Former [2002/18] | Electrochemical machining process, electrode therefor and turbine bucket with turbulated cooling passage | ||
Former [2002/18] | Procédé d'usinage par électrochimie, électrode pour le procédé, et aubes de turbines avec des passages de refroidissemnet avec écoulement turbulent | Examination procedure | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3984911 (KRUG MANFRED, et al) [A] 1-9* abstract *; | [A]US5306401 (FIERKENS RICHARD H J [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]US5695322 (JACOBSON CRAIG ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 10 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 5 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 24 *; | [X]US5738493 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [X] 10 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - line 64 * |