EP1201255 - Biological indicator for sterilization processes with double buffer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | ||
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hui, Henry K. 22822 Skyview Way Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
Feldman, Leslie A. 26910 Lost Oak Court Calabasas Hills, CA 91301 / US | 03 /
Gorham, Richard A. 832 Quivera Street Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309111.1 | 26.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | US20000699728 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: US 699728 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1201255 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1201255 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201255 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/28, C12Q1/22 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
C12Q1/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
G01N31/226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/41] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Biologischer Sterilisationsindikator mit Doppelpuffersystem | [2002/18] | English: | Biological indicator for sterilization processes with double buffer system | [2002/18] | French: | Indicateur biologique de stérilisation contenant un système à double tampon | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 18.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | 05.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4291122 (ORELSKI PAULA A) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4743537 (MCCORMICK PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9606183 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 21-25 * example 2 *; | [A]WO9920790 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [Y]US5942438 (ANTONOPLOS PATRICIA A [US], et al) [Y] 20 * column 1 *; | [XY]US5968807 (KAISER JAMES JAY [US]) [X] 1-19,21-26 * the whole document * [Y] 20 |