EP1227462 - Plasma display and method for driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 1815-1, Ohaza Tajiri Kunitomi-cho Higashimorokata-gun Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | [2008/39] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Limited 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Setoguchi, Noriaki, c/o Kyushu FHP Limited 1815-1, Oaza Tajiri, Kunitomo-cho Higashimorokata-gun, Miyazaki 880-1194 / JP | 02 /
Takamori, T., Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Eiji, c/o Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | 04 /
Kishi, T., Fujitsu Hitachi Plasma Display Ltd. 2-1, Sakado 3-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309113.7 | 26.10.2001 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | JP20010012419 | 19.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001012419 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1227462 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1227462 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/28 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
G09G3/2932 (EP,US);
H01J11/22 (KR);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G2310/0218 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0228 (EP,US);
G09G2320/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Plasmabildanzeigevorrichtung und ihr Ansteuerungsverfahren | [2002/31] | English: | Plasma display and method for driving the same | [2002/31] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'image par plasma et son procédé de commande | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/44] | Request for further processing for: | 30.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]EP0810577 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9,14,15 * column 17, line 37 - column 18, line 18 * * column 22, line 10 - line 55; figure 21 * * column 23, line 4 - line 44; figure 22 *[Y] 10-13; | [X]EP0964383 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0030]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XY]KR20000061883 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-9,14,15 * abstract * [Y] 10-13; | [T]US6356261 (KIM SANG-CHUL [KR]) [T] * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 52; figure 4 * |