EP1205443 - Biological anaerobic fluidised bed apparatus for wastewater treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/20] | Biological anaerobic fluidised bed apparatus | ||
[2006/23] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Waste Management Systems plc Lynwood House, 373-375 Station Road Harrow HA1 2AW Middlesex / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states International Waste Management Systems plc Lynwood House, 373-375 Station Road Harrow HA1 2AW, Middlesex / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Josse, Juan Carlos 34648 Via Catalina Capistrano Beach, California 92624 / US | 02 /
Sutherlin, John William 3332 Grand Route, St John Street New Orleans, Louisiana 70119 / US | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/20] | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields GB-London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309374.5 | 06.11.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | US20000839653 | 07.11.2000 Original published format: US 839653 | [2002/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1205443 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/28 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
C02F3/2806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fliessbettreaktor für die anaerobe biologische Abwasserbehandlung | [2006/23] | English: | Biological anaerobic fluidised bed apparatus for wastewater treatment | [2006/23] | French: | Réacteur à lit fluidisé pour le traitement biologique anérobie des eaux usées | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/20] | Fliessbettreaktor für anaerobe biologische Behandlung, | ||
Former [2002/20] | Biological anaerobic fluidised bed apparatus | ||
Former [2002/20] | Réacteur à lit fluidisé pour traitement biologique anaérobie | Examination procedure | 18.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2004 | 30.11.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3819965 (LIAS FRANKEN LEICHTBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 35 - line 36 * * column 4, line 25 - line 29 * * column 4, line 10 - line 16 *; | [XD]US4482458 (ROVEL JEAN-MARIE [FR], et al) [XD] 1 * column 2, line 58 - line 59 * * column 3, line 50 - line 55; figure . *; | [X]EP0758680 (MATSUMURA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, line 27 - line 36 * * page 14, line 17 - line 18 * * page 14, column 34; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0311216 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL]) [A] 8-12 * the whole document * |