EP1265376 - Method for multiple antenna transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gollamudi, Sridhar 28 Wiley Ct. Morris Plains, New Jersey 07950 / US | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2002/50] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309540.1 | 12.11.2001 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | US20010873706 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: US 873706 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1265376 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1265376 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1265376 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L1/06, H04L1/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H04B7/0634 (EP,US);
H04B7/0656 (EP,US);
H04L1/0001 (EP,US);
H04L1/0618 (EP,US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0689 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/50] | H04B7/06, H04L1/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/37] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Meherfachantenneübertragung | [2002/50] | English: | Method for multiple antenna transmission | [2002/50] | French: | Procede pour emission sur antennes multiples | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.01.2005 | [2007/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1073212 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038] , [0052] , [0058] - [0063] ** figures 4,5 *; | [PX]WO0169800 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 1-10 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 2 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 9 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 9 * * page 14, line 1 - line 15 * * page 15, line 3 - line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [X] - JOENGREN G ET AL, "UTILIZING QUANTIZED FEEDBACK INFORMATION IN ORTHOGONAL SPACE-TIME BLOCK CODING", GLOBECOM'00. 2000 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, NOV. 27 - DEC. 1, 2000, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20001127), vol. 2 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-6452-X, pages 995 - 999, XP001017234 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [II.A.] - [II.C.] - [0IV.] , [00V.] * * figure 1 * |