EP1229546 - Optical disk player [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong Kwonsun-gu Suwon-city Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Kwonsun-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Cheol-gyun, 132-202, Jukong-1-danji Hwanggol maeul, 955-1, Youngtong-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Rooney, John-Paul, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | ||
Former [2002/32] | Robinson, Ian Michael, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309816.5 | 22.11.2001 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | KR20010005723 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: KR 2001005723 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229546 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/19, G11B27/30, G11B19/12 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
G11B27/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/004 (KR);
G11B19/04 (EP,US);
G11B19/28 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] | Title | German: | Optischer Plattenspieler | [2002/32] | English: | Optical disk player | [2002/32] | French: | Lecteur de disque optique | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6081490 (KURODA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - column 3, line 11 * * column 6, line 32 - column 8, line 52 * * column 9, line 37 - column 11, line 33 *; | [XP]US2001026515 (MOCHIZUKI MASAKI [JP], et al) [XP] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0167] *; | [XA]EP0967612 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 58 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 7 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 7 * * column 12, line 38 - column 13, line 28 * * figures 2,3; claims 6-8 * [A] 2; | [A]JP2000076655 ; | [A]EP0872838 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - line 52 * * column 3, line 3 - line 13 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 34 * * column 1, line 54 - column 13, line 41 * * column 16, line 38 - column 17, line 17 * * column 23, line 24 - column 31, line 30 * * figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]EP0945866 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 50 - column 3, line 48 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 57 * * column 13, line 17 - column 14, line 17 * * column 15, line 34 - column 17, line 37 * * figures 2,3,6,9 *; | [A]EP0977191 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 10, line 18 - column 14, line 19 * * figures 3-5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000076655 A 20000314 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |