EP1282105 - Method for displaying color images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Plasma Patent Licensing Co., Ltd. 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irie, Katsuya c/o Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Awamoto, Kenji c/o Fujitsu Limited 4-1-1 Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01309948.6 | 27.11.2001 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | JP20010232246 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001232246 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282105 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1282105 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G09G3/28 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G09G5/20 (EP,US);
G09G3/291 (KR);
G09G3/2003 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2360/18 (EP,US);
G09G3/298 (EP,US);
G09G5/003 (EP,US);
G09G5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anzeige von Farbbildern | [2003/06] | English: | Method for displaying color images | [2003/06] | French: | Procédé pour l'affichage d'images en couleur | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6252613 (BOREL THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 15 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 64 * * figures 7a,7b,9,12 *; | [PX]EP1143404 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0039] ** figures 1-5 * |