EP1211130 - Footrest fastening clip and footrest assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423, Kirkwood Highway Neward, Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Newfrey LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | ||
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states Emhart LLC Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dendo, M., c/o Pop Rivet Fastener KK Hosoda, Noyori-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Daigaku, K., c/o Toyota Jidousha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 417-8572 / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Haar, Lucas H., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar, Karlstrasse 23 (Haus Otto) 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/23] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Black & Decker, 210 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310085.4 | 30.11.2001 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | JP20000365531 | 30.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000365531 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1211130 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60N3/06 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B60N3/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2003/09] |
Former [2002/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungsclip für Fussstütze und Fussstützenzusammenbau | [2002/23] | English: | Footrest fastening clip and footrest assembly | [2002/23] | French: | Elément de retenue pour un repose-pied et ensemble repose-pied | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH11247822 ; | [DA]JPH10305747 ; | [A]EP0590993 (EMHART INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 53 - column 5, line 49; figures 13,14 *; | [A]GB2344569 (EMHART INC [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 3, line 12 - page 6, line 22; figures 8-11 *; | [A]EP0215561 (TUCKER FASTENERS LTD [GB], et al) | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11247822 A 19990914 (NIPPON STAD WELDING KK) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10305747 A 19981117 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1,6 * abstract * |