Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100506082B | Global Dossier | 04.08.2005 | B1 | KR20020048544 | 24.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3773843B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2006 | B2 | JP2002225292 | 14.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1216837 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2007 | B1 | EP1216837 | 26.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60127519T | 06.12.2007 | T2 | DE60127519D1 | 10.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6676844 | 13.01.2004 | B2 | US2002096489 | 25.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 |