EP1216837 - Method for manufacturing ink-jet printhead having hemispherical ink chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sang-wook 706-404 Sungwon Apt., 143 Geumgok-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-city / KR | 02 /
Oh, Yong-soo 206307 Satbyul Maeul Dongsung Apt., 35 Bundangdong Bungdang-gu, Seongnam-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Hyeon-cheol 5-908 Samik Apt., 1018 Bangbae 3-dong Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310421.1 | 13.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | KR20000077744 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: KR 2000077744 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1216837 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1216837 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/14137 (EP,US);
B41J2/235 (KR);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/12] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Herstellung eines Tintenstrahldruckkopfes mit halbkugelförmigen Tintenkammern | [2002/26] | English: | Method for manufacturing ink-jet printhead having hemispherical ink chamber | [2002/26] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication d'une tête d'impression jet d'encre ayant des chambres à encre hémisphériques | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5841452 (SILVERBROOK KIA [AU]) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * figures 4A,17 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 4 * * column 9, line 33 - line 49 * * column 34, line 22 *; | [Y]US6093330 (CHONG JOHN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 10 * * column 4, line 4 - line 5 ** column 4, line 22 - line 30 * |