EP1215617 - Method of providing user interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Patent Department, Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hecht, David L. 2001 Barbara Drive Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
Petrie, Glen W. 26150 Pierce Road Los Gatos, alifornia 95030 / US | 03 /
Flores, Noah L. 2380 Rodeo Gulch Road (PO Box 5219) Soquel (Santa Cruz), California 95073 / US | 04 /
Gorbet, Matthew G. 3975 18th Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2002/25] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/25] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310477.3 | 14.12.2001 | [2002/25] | Priority number, date | US20000737869 | 18.12.2000 Original published format: US 737869 | [2002/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1215617 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1215617 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G06K19/06, G06F3/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
G06K7/143 (EP,US);
G06F3/002 (EP,US);
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
G06K7/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | G06K7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/33] |
Former [2002/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Méthode fournissant une interface utilisateur | [2002/25] | English: | Method of providing user interface | [2002/25] | French: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer Benutzerschnittstelle | [2002/25] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5883627 (PLEYER SVEN [US]) [A] 1,7* column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 3 *; | [DA]US6000621 (HECHT DAVID L [US], et al) [DA] 1,7 * abstract * | Examination | EP1016953 |