EP1220561 - Connection acceptance control scheme by obtaining available quality value [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitazawa, Daisuke 21-26-203, Noukendai-dori, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0053 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Hijin 36-4, Kounandai 1-chome, Kounan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 234-0054 / JP | 03 /
Umeda, Narumi 40-14, Tomioka-Nishi 6-chome, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0052 / JP | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London WC1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310688.5 | 20.12.2001 | [2002/27] | Priority number, date | JP20000402957 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000402957 | [2002/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1220561 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1220561 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1220561 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22, H04L12/56 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
H04W28/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/15 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/70 (US);
H04L47/788 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/805 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2003/19] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kontrollschema für Verbindungszugang durch Verwendung eines verfügbaren Qualitätswertes | [2002/27] | English: | Connection acceptance control scheme by obtaining available quality value | [2002/27] | French: | Schéma de contrôle d'acceptation d'une connection utilisant une valeur de qualité disponible | [2002/27] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Request for further processing for: | 27.08.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0750440 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-18 * columns 1-2 * * columns 21-22 *; | [Y] - SUGIH JAMIN ET AL, "A MEASUREMENT-BASED ADMISSION CONTROL ALGORITHM FOR INTEGRATED SERVICES PACKET NETWORKS", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY. NEW YORK, US, (19951001), vol. 25, no. 4, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 2 - 13, XP000541646 [Y] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/217391.217396 | [Y] - ACTS Project AC085 Wireless ATM Network Demonstrator Deliverable 1D5, ACTS, (19980831), XP002201817 [Y] 1-18 * page 12, paragraph 3.2.4 * * page 38, paragraph 8.1.3 * | [A] - RONG-FONG CHANG ET AL, "QOS-based call admission control for integrated voice and data in CDMA systems", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 1996. PIMRC'96., SEVENTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 15-18 OCT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961015), ISBN 0-7803-3692-5, pages 623 - 627, XP010209246 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1996.567470 |