EP1216614 - Canine halter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Company of Animals Limited Ruxbury Farm, St. Annes Hill Road Chertsey Surrey KT16 9NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states The Company of Animals Limited Ruxbury Farm, St. Annes Hill Road Chertsey, Surrey KT16 9NL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mugford, Vivienne Ruxbury Farm, St.Annes Hill Road Chertsey, Surrey KT16 9NL / GB | [2002/26] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/26] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01310726.3 | 20.12.2001 | [2002/26] | Priority number, date | GB20000031283 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: GB 0031283 | [2002/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1216614 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1216614 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K27/00 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
A01K27/002 (EP);
A01K27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/09] |
Former [2002/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hundegeschirr | [2002/26] | English: | Canine halter | [2002/26] | French: | Harnais pour chien | [2002/26] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4483275 (DE GROOT ALICE A [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]GB2163338 (DEGROOT ALICE A) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * * claims 1,3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6062005 (ROBERTS MARVIN E [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5992352 (BORCHELT PETER L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * |