Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
12.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
10.01.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.12.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] |
09.09.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
07.01.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.07.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |