EP1116803 - Method of pickling aluminium can bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 531-0077 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Nippon Paint Co., Ltd. 1-2 Oyodokita 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-0077 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoshi, Ikeda 13-2, Chuo 2-chome Yamato-shi, Kanagawa 242-0021 / JP | 02 /
Masayuki, Kamimura 18-1, Owada 4-chome Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0025 / JP | 03 /
Kazuo, Sonomura 21-6-701, Higashikanamachi 6-chome Katsushika-ku, Tokyo 125-0041 / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400048.3 | 10.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | JP20000003623 | 12.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000003623 | JP20010000149 | 04.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001000149 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116803 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116803 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23G1/12, C23G1/36, C23G3/00 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C23G1/125 (EP);
C23G3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/29] | C23G1/12, C23G1/36 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/04] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Beitzen von Aluminiumdosen | [2001/29] | English: | Method of pickling aluminium can bodies | [2001/29] | French: | Procédé pour le décapage de boîtes en aluminium | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.04.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9638238 (HENKEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 10, lines 22-25 * * page 14, lines 1-25 *; | [X]WO9502079 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [X] 1 * page 8, lines 8-20 *; | [X]US4124407 (BINNS ROBERT E) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 22 *; | [X]USRE27662E (HAMILTON A. J.) [X] 1-3 * column 7, lines 1-12 *; | [A]US5259960 (BECK LESLIE M [US], et al); | [PX]EP0976852 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * page 5, line 47; table 1 * |