EP1138388 - Catalytic composition for dimerisation, codimerisation and oligomerisation of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Commereuc, Dominique 32 rue Abel Vacher 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Le Pennec, Dominique 16 rue du Clos des Bourgognes 78910 Orgerus / FR | 03 /
Olivier-Bourbigou, Hélène 9 Place des Impressionnistes 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2001/40] | Application number, filing date | 01400173.9 | 19.01.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | FR20000001512 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001512 | [2001/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1138388 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138388 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/14, B01J31/18, B01J31/24, B01J31/02, C07C2/36, C08F10/00 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
C07C2/32 (EP,US);
B01J31/0284 (EP,US);
B01J31/0288 (EP,US);
B01J31/143 (EP,US);
B01J31/1845 (EP,US);
B01J31/185 (EP,US);
B01J31/2409 (EP,US);
C07C2/26 (EP,US);
B01J2231/20 (EP,US);
B01J2531/847 (EP,US);
B01J31/14 (EP,US);
B01J31/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2002/26] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Katalysatorzusammensetzung zur Dimerisierung, Kodimerisierung und Oligomerisierung von Olefinen | [2001/40] | English: | Catalytic composition for dimerisation, codimerisation and oligomerisation of olefins | [2001/40] | French: | Composition catalytique pour la dimérisation, la codimérisation et l'oligomérisation des oléfines | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0646413 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2611700 | FR2659871 | FR2710280 |