EP1122224 - Fused cast alumina-zirconia-silica based products with an improved microstructure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE EUROPEENNE DES PRODUITS REFRACTAIRES Les Miroirs 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2001/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaubil, Michel Marc 5bis, Place de la Bulle 84000 Avignon / FR | 02 /
Boussant-Roux, Yves Marcel Léon 1350 Chemin de la Verdière 84140 Montfavet / FR | 03 /
Sertain, Emmanuel Jean-Marie Apt. 155, 82 rue de l'Abbé Carton 75014 Paris / FR | 04 /
Zanoli, Alain Paul Bernard 28 rue Joseph Vernet 84000 Avignon / FR | [2004/33] |
Former [2001/32] | 01 /
Gaubil, Michel Marc 5bis, Place de la Bulle 84000 Avignon / FR | ||
02 /
Boussant-Roux, Yves Marcel Léon 112 rue Lecorbusier 84000 Avignon / FR | |||
03 /
Sertain, Emmanuel Jean-Marie Apt. 155, 82 rue de l'Abbé Carton 75014 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
Zanoli, Alain Paul Bernard 4 rue Neuve Saint-Charles 84000 Avignon / FR | Representative(s) | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Colas, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet de Boisse et Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400227.3 | 30.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | FR20000001192 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0001192 | [2001/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122224 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122224 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122224 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/109, C04B35/484 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C04B35/484 (EP,US);
C04B35/109 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | C04B35/109 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schmelzgegossene Aluminiumoxid-Zirkonoxid-Siliziumoxid Produkte mit verbesserter Mikrostruktur | [2001/32] | English: | Fused cast alumina-zirconia-silica based products with an improved microstructure | [2001/32] | French: | Produits électrofondus à base d'alumine-zircone-silice à microstructure améliorée | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | TR | 18.08.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | CY | 30.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
TR | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2438552 (FIELD THEODORE E) [AD] 1-6 * column 4, line 73 - line 75 * * table VI ** claim - *; | [A]FR2363535 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 31 * * page 6, line 12 - line 25 *; | [X]EP0235909 (KENNECOTT CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 43 - line 48 * * column 5, line 9 - line 22 * * column 5, line 28 - line 46 * * column 6, line 6 - line 19 * * column 8, line 9 - line 18 * * figure 4 * * claim 15 *; | [X]EP0939065 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] * * example 43; table 5 * |