Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1122049 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2004 | B1 | EP1122049 | 08.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0001304 | 02.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60102845T | 20.01.2005 | T2 | DE60102845D1 | 27.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0001304 | 02.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2220681T | 16.12.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0001304 | 02.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2804364 | 13.09.2002 | B1 | FR2804364 | 03.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0001304 | 02.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001026851 | 04.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0001304 | 02.02.2000 |