EP1122049 - Method for manufacturing a plastic part having a decorative film and thus obtained part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2001/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilmarcher, Olivier 25 rue de la ville 01460 Montreal-La-Cluse / FR | [2001/39] |
Former [2001/32] | 01 /
Hilmarcher, Olivier 8 Route de la Gare 01590 Dortan / FR | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 191 rue Saint Honoré 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/46] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2001/32] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400248.9 | 01.02.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | FR20000001304 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001304 | [2001/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122049 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122049 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
B32B37/153 (EP,US);
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14237 (EP,US);
B29K2995/002 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0087 (EP,US);
B32B38/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/24] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kunstoffteils mit Dekorfolie und danach erhaltenes Teil | [2001/32] | English: | Method for manufacturing a plastic part having a decorative film and thus obtained part | [2001/32] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une pièce en matière plastique comportant un film décoratif, et pièce ainsi obtenue | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 09.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | 02
20.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. Schwabacher Strasse 482 90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
20.01.2005
28.01.2005
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
Former [2005/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.2005
Leonhard Kurz GmbH & Co. Schwabacher Strasse 482 D-90763 Fürth / DE Opponent's representative Zinsinger, Norbert Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz Patentanwälte Merianstrasse 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
20.01.2005
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 25.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.07.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.08.2005 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2005 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.11.2006 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/15] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9403337 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-12,14-19,21,22,24,29,30 * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 11 * * page 10, line 15 - line 24 * * page 12, line 34 - page 13, line 33 * * page 15, line 1 - line 18 * * page 16, line 4 - page 17, line 12 * * page 18, line 12 - page 19, line 20 * * page 20, line 3 - line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5916643 (SPAIN PATRICK LEON [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-12,14-19,21,22,24,29,30 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 36 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 45 * * column 11, line 22 - line 43 * * column 13, line 28 - column 14, line 56 * * column 16, line 28 - column 18, line 31 * * column 19, line 38 - column 20, line 55 * * column 33, line 1 - line 38; figures 4-12 *; | [A]WO9212008 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-8,10-14,18,23,24,29,30 * page 1, line 4 - line 14 * * page 2, line 5 - line 33 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 33 * |