EP1122135 - Vehicle rear seat, its seatbelt buckles with adjustable fixing position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamouard, François 51 rue de la Pièce du Parc 78960 Voisins le Bretonneux / FR | [2001/32] | Application number, filing date | 01400264.6 | 02.02.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | FR20000001301 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001301 | [2001/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122135 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122135 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/22 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
B60R22/22 (EP);
B60N2/58 (EP);
B60R2022/207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [2004/05] |
Former [2002/22] | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT | ||
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug- Rücksitzbank, ihre Gurtschlösser mit veränderbarer Einhakposition | [2001/32] | English: | Vehicle rear seat, its seatbelt buckles with adjustable fixing position | [2001/32] | French: | Banquette arrière de véhicule, ses boucles de ceintures de sécurité à position d'accrochage réglable | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 09.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 05.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.01.2004 | [2005/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2774959 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figure - * * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 21 *; | [A]FR2726521 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US4915451 (FORGET KEN M [CA], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 23 - line 62 * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 36 * |