Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
12.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
12.12.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
09.12.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
09.12.2003 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
28.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
10.02.2003 | Renewal fee | |
16.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
10.07.2002 | Change - extension states | |
05.07.2002 | Change - applicant | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] |
28.06.2002 | Loss of particular rights | |
15.04.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
12.04.2002 | Change - designated states | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
15.03.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
02.03.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] |
22.06.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] |