EP1143725 - Information system with interactive multimedia information links in a network with a videophone switchboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chevillard, Laurent 5, rue Dufour 78440 Issou / FR | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400295.0 | 06.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | FR20000001606 | 09.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001606 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143725 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
G09F27/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nachrichtensystem mit interaktiven Multimedianachrichtenanschlüssungen an ein Netzwerk mit Videotelefonzentrale | [2001/41] | English: | Information system with interactive multimedia information links in a network with a videophone switchboard | [2001/41] | French: | Système d'information comportant des bornes multimédia interactives d'information en réseau avec un centre d'appels visiophoniques | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9636160 (DAVIDSOHN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,13 * page 7, line 3 - page 9, line 29 * * page 13, line 1 - line 29 * * page 26, line 1 - page 27, line 34 * * page 47, line 1 - page 49, line 24 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A] - OHTA N ET AL, "REGIONAL COMMUNITY NETWORK SYSTEM", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,JP,INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, (19960701), vol. E79-B, no. 7, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 890 - 898, XP000628621 [A] 1-13 * page 891, column L, line 5 - page 897, column R, line 7 * * figures 1-5,7-9 * | [A] - KIMIAKI SHOJI, "DEVELOPMENT OF VIDEO COMMUNICATIONS PRODUCTS FOR AN EXPANDING RANGEOF USES", NTT REVIEW,JP,TELECOMMUNICATIONS ASSOCIATION, TOKYO, (19951101), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 56 - 64, XP000548925 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |