EP1231620 - Control panel with laser backlight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borgonovo, Alberto Flat 9E, Blessings Garden, 95 Robinson Road Hong Kong / CN | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Rossmanith, Manfred Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 01400359.4 | 12.02.2001 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1231620 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H19/18 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
H01H19/186 (EP);
H01H2009/184 (EP);
H01H2219/06 (EP);
H01H9/0235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bedienungstafel mit Laserrückbeleuctung | [2002/33] | English: | Control panel with laser backlight | [2002/33] | French: | Tableau de commande avec laser d'éclairage par l'arrière | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/47] | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5128842 (KENMOCHI YOSHIO [JP]) [Y] 1 * column W *; | [Y]US5408060 (MUURINEN JARI [FI]) [Y] 1 * column 5, lines 46,47 *; | [A]US5684513 (DECKER MARK RANDALL [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 6; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US6163247 (O'MEARA JAMES C [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * |