EP1128196 - Monomode optical fiber cable for WDM optical fiber transmission net [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draka Comteq B.V. De Boelelaan 7 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Draka comteq B.V. De Boelelaan 7 1083 HJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states Draka Comteq B.V. Rhijnspoorplein 22 1018 TX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Montmorillon, Louis-Anne 32, rue Truffaut 75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
Nouchi, Pascale 2, avenue Bossuet 78600 Maisons Laffitte / FR | 03 /
Fleury, Ludovic Résidence "La Forêt", 17, rue Jean Racine 78390 Bois d'Arcy / FR | 04 /
Sillard, Pierre 11, rue de Versailles 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Blokland, Arie Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Blokland, Arie Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau, P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/38] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/35] | Laroche, Danièle, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400362.8 | 12.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | FR20000002316 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0002316 | [2001/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128196 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128196 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/02, G02B6/036 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
G02B6/03644 (EP,US);
G02B6/02014 (EP,US);
G02B6/02242 (EP,US);
G02B6/02271 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | G02B6/16, G02B6/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Monomodales optisches Faserkabel für ein faseroptisches WDM-Übertragungsnetz | [2006/49] | English: | Monomode optical fiber cable for WDM optical fiber transmission net | [2001/35] | French: | Fibre optique monomode en cable pour reseaux de transmission à fibre optique à multiplexage en longueurs d'onde | [2001/35] |
Former [2001/35] | Monomodales optisches Faserkabel für WDM Faser-optisches Übertragungsnetz | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 15.07.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0368014 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 33 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9733188 (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** column 5, line 54 - column 7, line 18 *; | [A]EP0959374 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A] - YANMING LIU ET AL, "Design and fabrication of locally dispersion-flattened large effective area fibers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, (19980920), XP002105704 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |