EP1134999 - Ultra-highspeed packet transfer ring network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Atsushi, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Park, Jin Hun, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Imajuku, Wataru, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Yamabayashi, Yoshiaki, c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center, 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Audier, Philippe André, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/38] | Audier, Philippe André, et al c/o Société de Protection des Inventions, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400500.3 | 27.02.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000052461 | 28.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000052461 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134999 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134999 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0003 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0041 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0073 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/18] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeits Paketübermittlungsring-Netzwerk | [2001/38] | English: | Ultra-highspeed packet transfer ring network | [2001/38] | French: | Réseau en anneau pour transmission de paquets ultra-rapide | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 03.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.03.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.03.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5488501 (BARNSLEY PETER E [GB]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [XA]WO0004668 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,8,11 * page 17, line 10 - page 18, line 8; figures 2,12 * [A] 2-7,9,10; | [A] - BLUMENTHAL D J ET AL, "ALL-OPTICAL LABEL SWAPPING WITH WAVELENGTH CONVERSION FOR WDM-IP NETWORKS WITH SUBCARRIER MULTIPLEXED ADDRESSING", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199911), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 1497 - 1499, XP000893800 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.803091 | Examination | EP0794684 | - WANG, "Demonstration of Gigabit WDMA Networks Using Parallelly Processed Subcarrier Hopping Pilot-Tone Signaling Technique", IEEE PHOTONIC LETTERS, (199607), vol. 8, no. 7, pages 933 - 934, XP000595624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.502275 |