EP1131990 - Variable rate spreading vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draghi, Umberto Drève de la Louve, 4, Watermael-Boitsfort 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400571.4 | 05.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | FR20000002866 | 06.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0002866 | [2001/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131990 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/00, A01C17/00, A01M7/00 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
A01C17/006 (EP);
A01B79/005 (EP);
A01M7/0089 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeug zum Verteilen mit regelbarer Abgabe | [2001/37] | English: | Variable rate spreading vehicle | [2001/37] | French: | Véhicule d'épandage à épandage variable | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/26] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5913915 (MCQUINN ALVIN E [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 11 - line 22 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 24 * * column 12, line 46 - column 13, line 5 * * column 16, line 40 - line 46 * * column 19, line 18 - column 20, line 36 * [Y] 2-4; | [YA]WO0004341 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 8 * * page 5, line 19 - line 26 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 18 * * page 10, line 32 - page 12, line 16 * * page 15, line 11 - line 15 * * figures 1,2,4,6 * [A] 1,5,6; | [Y]US6009354 (FLAMME DAVID D [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 8, line 9 - line 12 *; | [A]US5923270 (SAMPO MIKKO [FI], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 4 - line 37 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A] - REITZ P ET AL, "INVESTIGATIONS ON A PARTICULAR YIELD MAPPING SYSTEM FOR COMBINE HARVESTERS", COMPUTERS AND ELECTRONICS IN AGRICULTURE,NL,AMSTERDAM, (19960201), vol. 14, no. 2/03, pages 137 - 150, XP002059527 [A] 1,6 * page 139 - page 140 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1699(95)00044-5 |