25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
30.05.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
22.06.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
16.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.06.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
20.01.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
12.01.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
23.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.08.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
19.04.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
05.04.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] |
28.07.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |