Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1133132 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2007 | B1 | EP1133132 | 12.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00400658 | 10.03.2000 | EP01400572 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6839320 | 04.01.2005 | B2 | US2002007412 | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00400658 | 10.03.2000 | EP01400572 | 06.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE368345T | 15.08.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP00400658 | 10.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60129496T | 17.04.2008 | T2 | DE60129496D1 | 06.09.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP00400658 | 10.03.2000 |