EP1133132 - Method to perfom end-to-end authentication, and related customer premises network termination and access network server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paridaens, Olivier Place Emile Bockstael 1 1020 Brussels / BE | 02 /
De Schrijver, Peter Paul Camille Leeuwerikenstraat 1 Bus 101 3001 Heverlee / BE | 03 /
T'Joens, Yves Robert Fernand Baron de Serretstraat 17 8200 Sint Michiels-Brugge / BE | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel Bell N.V. Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 01400572.2 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | EP20000400658 | 10.03.2000 Original published format: EP 00400658 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133132 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133132 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/56 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/0846 (EP,US);
H04L63/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/37] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur end-zu-end-Authentifizierung, Teilnehmernetzanschlussgerät und Zugriffnetzwerkserver | [2001/37] | English: | Method to perfom end-to-end authentication, and related customer premises network termination and access network server | [2001/37] | French: | Procédé pour effectuer authentification de bout en bout, équipement local d'abonné termination de réseau, et serveur d'accès au réseau | [2001/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 30.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2007 | BE | 25.07.2007 | CH | 25.07.2007 | CY | 25.07.2007 | DK | 25.07.2007 | FI | 25.07.2007 | LI | 25.07.2007 | NL | 25.07.2007 | TR | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.10.2007 | GR | 26.10.2007 | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | IE | 06.03.2008 | LU | 06.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
TR | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2008 | ||
LU | 06.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2008 | ||
LU | 06.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
CY | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.10.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
DK | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
BE | 25.07.2007 | ||
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.10.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 25.07.2007 | |
CH | 25.07.2007 | ||
FI | 25.07.2007 | ||
LI | 25.07.2007 | ||
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 25.07.2007 | |
NL | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
PT | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 25.07.2007 | |
ES | 05.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0977457 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, lines 33-41 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 9 * * column 10, lines 14-28 * * column 17, lines 19-46 * * column 32, line 58 - column 33, line 5 * * claim 30 *; | [A]US5933784 (GALLAGHER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, lines 61-63 * * column 11, line 15 - column 12, line 67 * * figure 8 *; | [A]WO9930460 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 10, lines 9-34 * * page 19, lines 8-29 * * figures 4,5 * | [A] - MUNEYOSHI SUZUKI, "The assignment of the Information Field and Protocol Identifier in the Q.2941 Generic Identifier and Q.2957 User-to-User Signaling for the Internet Protocol", NETWORK WORKIN GROUP, (20000111), XP002150308 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |