EP1143218 - Resistive element for a pyrotechnic initiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vishay S.A. 199, Boulevard de la Madeleine, BP 159 06003 Nice Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Vishay S.A. 199, Boulevard de la Madeleine, BP 159 06003 Nice Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flassayer, Claude 1845 Chemin de Provence 06640 Saint Jeannet / FR | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | de Roquemaurel, Bruno, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | de Roquemaurel, Bruno, et al Novamark Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400638.1 | 09.03.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | FR20000004294 | 04.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0004294 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143218 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1143218 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/13 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
F42B3/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Widerstandselement für einen pyrotechnischen Zünder | [2001/41] | English: | Resistive element for a pyrotechnic initiator | [2001/41] | French: | Element resistif pour initiateur pyrotechnique | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.04.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | IE | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | CY | 09.03.2005 | LU | 09.03.2005 | BE | 31.03.2005 | CH | 31.03.2005 | LI | 31.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CY | 09.03.2005 | ||
LU | 09.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CY | 09.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
LU | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.03.2005 | ||
LI | 31.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3537820 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]) [A] * abstract ** column 4, line 15 - line 26 *; | [YA]WO9624024 (QUANTIC IND INC [US]) [Y] 3,5,8 * figures 8A-9B * * page 12, line 4 - page 15, line 13 * [A] 9,10; | [A]WO9742462 (SCB TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,3,8 * figures 1,2; claims 1,6,9 *; | [YA]WO9828792 (SCB TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 2,9,10 * figures 3,4 * * page 9, line 13 - line 28 * [A] 3; | [XY]WO9854535 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,11 * figures 1A-3; claims 1,13,20 * * page 1, line 10 - line 22 * * page 2, line 20 - line 24 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 32 * [Y] 2,3,5,8-10 |