EP1136696 - Process and device for positioning a combustion engine in a favourable starting position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA 62 Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroen Automobiles SA 62 Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gohin, Gérard 12, rue du Châtaignier des Dames 78210 Saint-Cyr L'Ecole / FR | 02 /
Basso, Vincent 5, chemin de la Brosse Chantecoq 91640 Briis sous Forges / FR | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Bouget, Lucien, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400722.3 | 20.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | FR20000003609 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0003609 | [2001/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136696 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136696 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02N17/08, F02N7/08, F01B27/08 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
F02N19/005 (EP);
F01B27/08 (EP);
F02D41/009 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
F02D41/062 (EP);
F02N11/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Posionierung einer Brennkraftmaschine in einer startgünstigen Position | [2001/39] | English: | Process and device for positioning a combustion engine in a favourable starting position | [2001/39] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de positionnement d'un moteur thermique, dans une position d'arrêt facilitant le démarrage | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/19] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | IE | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
IE | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3762387 (BLOMBERG F, et al) [A] 1-3,5 * figure 1 * * column A * * column 1, line 1 - line 50 * * column 2, line 20 - line 63 *; | [XA]US5687682 (REMBOLD HELMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 24 - line 67 * * column 7, line 1 - line 59 * [A] 11,12; | [A]EP0985822 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9 * figure 1 ** abstract * |