EP1136821 - Method for the evaluation of the stability of a welded assembly and corresponding apparatus for measuring the velocity of ultrasonic surface waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/39] | Methode for the evaluation of the stability of a welded assembly and corresponding apparatus for measuring the velocity of ultrasonic surface waves | ||
[2003/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA MOTEURS 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Snecma Moteurs 2, boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatellier, Jean-Yves 52, Avenue Pierre Ronsard 94110 Arcueil / FR | 02 /
Ramahefasolo, Daniel 33, rue des sablons 91450 Echarcon / FR | [2001/39] | Application number, filing date | 01400739.7 | 22.03.2001 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | FR20000003696 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0003696 | [2001/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136821 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1136821 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/18, G01N29/10 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
G01N29/348 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/223 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0231 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/057 (EP,US);
G01N2291/102 (EP,US);
G01N2291/103 (EP,US);
G01N2291/267 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/24] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Messung der Festigkeit einer geschweissten Anordnung sowie hierauf beruhende Geräte zur Messung der Geschwindigkeit von Ultraschall-Oberflächenwellen | [2003/02] | English: | Method for the evaluation of the stability of a welded assembly and corresponding apparatus for measuring the velocity of ultrasonic surface waves | [2003/02] | French: | Procédé d'évaluation de résilience d'un assemblage soudé et appareils d'analyse correspondant mesurant de vitesse d'ondes ultrasonores superficielles | [2003/02] |
Former [2001/39] | Methode zur Messung der Festigkeit einer geschweissten Anordnung sowie hierauf beruhendes Gerät zur Messung der Geschwindigkeit von akustischen Oberflächenwellen | ||
Former [2001/39] | Methode for the evaluation of the stability of a welded assembly and corresponding apparatus for measuring the velocity of ultrasonic surface waves | ||
Former [2001/39] | Procédé d'évaluation de résilience d'un assemblage soudé et appareil d'analyse correspondant mesurant de vitesse d'ondes ultrasonores superficielles | Examination procedure | 30.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5920014 (WASCHKIES ECKHARD [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 8, line 10 - line 45; figure 2.1 *; | [A]US5408882 (MCKINLEY BARBARA J [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 14; figure 4 *; | [A]DE19612925 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 12 - line 31 * |