Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1152198 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2004 | B1 | EP1152198 | 07.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0005645 | 03.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE282183T | 15.11.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0005645 | 03.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60107008T | 16.03.2006 | T2 | DE60107008D1 | 16.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0005645 | 03.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2231402T | 16.05.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0005645 | 03.05.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2808585 | 28.06.2002 | B1 | FR2808585 | 09.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0005645 | 03.05.2000 |