EP1160385 - Process and apparatus for anchoring a container inside a pit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLI International 21, rue d'Artois 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Halgand, Guy, c/o Gaz Liquefies Industrie 21, rue d'Artois 75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bregnon, Romuald, c/o Gaz Liquefies Industrie 21, rue d'Artois 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [2001/49] | Application number, filing date | 01401080.5 | 26.04.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | FR20000007007 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0007007 | [2001/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1160385 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160385 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E02D31/12, E03F11/00, B65D88/76 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
B65D88/76 (EP);
E02D27/38 (EP);
E03F11/00 (EP);
Y02A20/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/49] | E03F11/00, B65D88/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Ankern eines Behälters in einem Graben | [2001/49] | English: | Process and apparatus for anchoring a container inside a pit | [2001/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'ancrage d'un récipient dans une fosse | [2004/15] |
Former [2001/49] | "Procédé et dispositif d'ancrage d'un récipient dans une fosse | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/25] | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.05.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | IE | 11.08.2004 | IT | 11.08.2004 | NL | 11.08.2004 | TR | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | SE | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | CY | 26.04.2005 | LU | 26.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
LU | 26.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
LU | 26.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CY | 26.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
TR | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
NL | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
IE | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
SE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4324508 (HILFIKER WILLIAM K, et al) [A] 6 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19520363 (ABO GES FUER ANWENDUNG UND BER [DE]) [Y] 1,4 * column 1, lines 3-34 * * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, lines 63-67 * * column 4, lines 7-35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP0758617 (LIOTARD METALLURG [FR]) [Y] 1,4 * column W * [A] 2,9; | [A]US5848776 (CRAIG DAVID DUNCAN [NZ], et al) [A] 1,4,9 * figure - *; | [A]DE19914917 (RONGE RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 7,9* figure 2 * |