blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1163896

EP1163896 - Film-forming cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2005  [2005/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / De la Poterie, Valérie
83, Allée de la Belle Cordière
77820 Le Chatelet en Brie / FR
02 / Mondet, Jean
90, Rue Roger Lemaine
93600 Aulnay Sous Bois / FR
03 / Auguste, Frédéric
18, Rue du Père Mazurié
94550 Chevilly-Larue / FR
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Kromer, Christophe
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Kromer, Christophe
L'OREAL - D.P.I., 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle
92585 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date01401505.111.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateFR2000000765615.06.2000         Original published format: FR 0007656
[2001/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1163896
Date:19.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/032, A61K7/48, A61K7/06
[2001/51]
CPC:
A61K8/90 (EP,US); A61K8/85 (EP,US); A61K8/87 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/51]
TitleGerman:Filmbildende kosmetische Zusammensetzung[2001/51]
English:Film-forming cosmetic composition[2001/51]
French:Composition cosmétique filmogène[2001/51]
Examination procedure19.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/34]
20.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/03]
03.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0305756  (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] * column 7, line 17 - line 28 * * claims 1-11 *;
 [A]EP0979642  (OREAL [FR]) [A] * examples 3-8 *;
 [A]EP0993824  (OREAL [FR]) [A] * example 4 *;
 [A]EP0943310  (OREAL [FR]) [A] * example 22 *;
 [A]FR2782917  (OREAL [FR]) [A] * example 3 *;
 [A]EP0367015  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] * claim 1 *;
 [A]FR2771927  (OREAL [FR]) [A] * example 1 *;
 [A]EP0873748  (FIABILA [FR]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]WO9939688  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US], et al) [A] * abstract *;
 [DA]WO9633690  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [DA]US4423031  (MURUI YUKIO [JP], et al);
 [DA]WO9515741  (OREAL [FR], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.